There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Marriage Protection Amendment

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to marriage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/28/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/26/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/16/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/13/2014
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/09/2013 07/10/2013 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/28/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/15/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.51.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.51. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2013)

Constitutional Amendment - Marriage Protection Amendment - Defines marriage in the United States as consisting only of the union of a man and a woman. Prohibits either the U.S. Constitution or the constitution of any state from being construed to require that marriage or the legal incidents of marriage be conferred upon any other union.