Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/23/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew