Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/09/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/17/2014