Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/20/2014