Refine your search

10 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-67.
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
12/19/2013 Presented to President.
12/18/2013 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 64 - 36. Record Vote Number: 281.(consideration: CR S8957)
12/12/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House recede and concur with an amendment in the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 332 - 94 (Roll no. 640).(text as House recede and concur in the Senate amendment: CR H8055-8066)
09/30/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On receding from the House amendments, and concurring in the Senate amendment with amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 228 - 201 (Roll no. 504).(consideration: CR H6040)
09/29/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On agreeing to the Senate amendment with amendment #1 Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 174 (Roll no. 497).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5987-5988)
09/27/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 44. Record Vote Number: 209.
09/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 189 (Roll No. 478).(text: CR H5773-5775)
09/10/2013 Introduced in House