Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 09/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/06/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/15/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/02/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/12/2014