There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

American Indian and Alaska Native health, education, and safety bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bureau of Indian Affairs, Bureau of Indian Education, and Indian Health Service Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Bureau of Indian Affairs, Bureau of Indian Education, and Indian Health Service Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making continuing appropriations for the Bureau of Indian Affairs, the Bureau of Indian Education, and the Indian Health Service for fiscal year 2014, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/14/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 233 - 160 (Roll no. 548).(text: CR 10/12/2013 H6548-6549)
10/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/2013SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
10/15/2013SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
10/14/2013-7:22pmHouseH.Amdt.480 On agreeing to the Grayson amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 161 - 228 (Roll no. 549).
10/14/2013-7:04pmHousePursuant to the rule, the Chair announced the amendment was not debatable.
10/14/2013-7:04pmHouseH.Amdt.480 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Grayson. (consideration: CR H6578-6579; text: CR H6578)
10/14/2013-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/14/2013-7:04pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 233 - 160 (Roll no. 548). (text: CR 10/12/2013 H6548-6549)
10/14/2013-6:55pmHouseOn motion to table the appeal of the ruling of the Chair. Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 180 (Roll no. 547).
10/14/2013-6:28pmHouseMr. Simpson moved to table the appeal of the ruling of the Chair.
10/14/2013-6:28pmHouseMrs. Kirkpatrick appealed the ruling of the chair. The question was then put on sustaining the ruling of the chair. (consideration: CR H6577-6578)
10/14/2013-6:27pmHousePoint of order sustained against the motion to recommit with instructions.
10/14/2013-6:27pmHouseMr. Simpson raised a point of order against the motion to recommit with instructions. Mr. Simpson stated that the proposed amendment contained in the motion to recommit with instructions was not germane to the underlying bill. Sustained by the Chair.
10/14/2013-6:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kirkpatrick motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to replace the underlying bill with the Senate Amendment to H.J. Res. 59, Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2014.
10/14/2013-6:20pmHouseMrs. Kirkpatrick moved to recommit with instructions to Appropriations. (consideration: CR H6576-6578; text: H6576)
10/14/2013-5:18pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H.J.Res. 80 were postponed.
10/14/2013-5:18pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6576)
10/14/2013-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed debate on H.J. Res. 80.
10/14/2013-5:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6574-6576, H6576-6579)
10/12/2013-10:35amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H.J.Res. 80 would be postponed.
10/12/2013-9:43amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 80.
10/12/2013-9:42amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 371. (consideration: CR H6548-6556)
10/03/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
10/03/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations10/03/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.80. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Bureau of Indian Affairs, Bureau of Indian Education, and Indian Health Service Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2014 - Makes appropriations for FY2014 for continuing projects or activities not otherwise specifically provided for that were conducted in FY2013 and for which appropriations, funds, or other authority were made available by Full Year Continuing Appropriations Act, 2013 (division F of P.L. 113-6) under the headings "Department of the Interior--Bureau of Indian Affairs and Bureau of Indian Education" and "Department of Health and Human Services--Indian Health Service."

Requires the rate of operations to be calculated to reflect the full amount of any reduction required in FY2013 pursuant to: (1) the Consolidated and Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2013 (P.L. 113-6), and (2) the presidential sequestration order dated March 1, 2013, except as attributable to budget authority made available by the Disaster Relief Appropriations Act, 2013 (P.L. 113-2).

Makes appropriations and funds made available and authority granted under this joint resolution available until whichever of the following first occurs: (1) enactment into law of an appropriation for any project or activity provided for in this joint resolution, (2) enactment into law of the applicable appropriations Act for FY2014 without any provision for such project or activity, or (3) December 15, 2013.

Requires implementation of this joint resolution so that only the most limited funding action be taken in order to provide for continuation of projects and activities.

Authorizes amounts made available for civilian personnel compensation and benefits to be apportioned up to the rate for operations necessary to avoid furloughs, consistent with the applicable appropriations Act for FY2013, except that such authority shall not be used until after the agency has taken all necessary actions to reduce or defer non-personnel-related administrative expenses.

Expresses the sense of Congress that this joint resolution may also be referred to as the American Indian and Alaska Native, Health, Education, and Safety Act.