Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/21/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2013