Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/17/2013