Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/04/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/18/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/23/2013