Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/05/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/17/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/03/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/27/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/18/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/06/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/06/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/19/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/19/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/12/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/23/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/30/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/07/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/07/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/07/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/09/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/14/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/23/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/08/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/09/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 09/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/13/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/13/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/03/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/03/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/03/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/08/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/10/2014