Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 10/29/2013