Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/03/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/04/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/11/2013