Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/24/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/24/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/29/2014