Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/14/2013