Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2013