There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Congress should not pass any legislation that would tax or confiscate personal savings accounts, including retirement accounts such as Individual Retirement Accounts (IRAs) and 401k plans, certificates of deposit (CDs), or other personal savings to provide financial relief for private businesses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/19/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/19/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/19/2013Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/19/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/21/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/21/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/21/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/21/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means03/19/2013 Referred to
House Financial Services03/19/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.129.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.129. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2013)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should refrain from considering or adopting any legislation that would: (1) tax or confiscate personal savings, including retirement accounts, certificates of deposit, or other personal savings and assets; or (2) provide financial relief to a private business or general sector of the American economy at taxpayer expense.