Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/27/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/06/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/29/2013