Text: H.Res.132 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 132 Introduced in House (IH)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 132

    Honoring the accomplishments and legacy of Cesar Estrada Chavez.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 21, 2013

Mr. Cardenas (for himself, Mr. Gutierrez, Mr. Pascrell, Mr. Sires, Mr. 
Serrano, Mrs. Napolitano, Mr. Pierluisi, Mr. Vargas, Mr. Hinojosa, Ms. 
   Linda T. Sanchez of California, Ms. Michelle Lujan Grisham of New 
 Mexico, Mr. Grijalva, Ms. Lee of California, and Mr. Honda) submitted 
   the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                    Oversight and Government Reform

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
    Honoring the accomplishments and legacy of Cesar Estrada Chavez.

Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez was born on March 31, 1927, near Yuma, Arizona;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez spent his early years on a family farm;
Whereas, at the age of 10, Cesar Estrada Chavez joined the thousands of migrant 
        farm workers laboring in fields and vineyards throughout the Southwest 
        after a bank foreclosure resulted in the loss of the family farm;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez, after attending more than 30 elementary and middle 
        schools and achieving an eighth grade education, left school to work 
        full-time as a farm worker to help support his family;
Whereas, at the age of 17, Cesar Estrada Chavez entered the United States Navy 
        and served the United States with distinction for 2 years;
Whereas, in 1948, Cesar Estrada Chavez returned from military service to marry 
        Helen Fabela, whom he had met while working in the vineyards of central 
        California;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez and Helen Fabela had 8 children;
Whereas, as early as 1949, Cesar Estrada Chavez was committed to organizing farm 
        workers to campaign for safe and fair working conditions, reasonable 
        wages, livable housing, and the outlawing of child labor;
Whereas, in 1952, Cesar Estrada Chavez joined the Community Service 
        Organization, a prominent Latino civil rights group, and worked with the 
        organization to coordinate voter registration drives and conduct 
        campaigns against discrimination in east Los Angeles;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez served as the national director of the Community 
        Service Organization;
Whereas, in 1962, Cesar Estrada Chavez left the Community Service Organization 
        to found the National Farm Workers Association, which eventually became 
        the United Farm Workers of America;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez was a strong believer in the principles of 
        nonviolence practiced by Mahatma Gandhi and Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez effectively used peaceful tactics that included 
        fasting for 25 days in 1968, 25 days in 1972, and 38 days in 1988, to 
        call attention to the terrible working and living conditions of farm 
        workers in the United States;
Whereas, under the leadership of Cesar Estrada Chavez, the United Farm Workers 
        of America organized thousands of migrant farm workers to fight for fair 
        wages, health care coverage, pension benefits, livable housing, and 
        respect;
Whereas, through his commitment to nonviolence, Cesar Estrada Chavez brought 
        dignity and respect to the organized farm workers and became an 
        inspiration to and a resource for individuals engaged in human rights 
        struggles throughout the world;
Whereas the influence of Cesar Estrada Chavez extends far beyond agriculture and 
        provides inspiration for those working to better human rights, empower 
        workers, and advance the American Dream, which includes all inhabitants 
        of the United States;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez died on April 23, 1993, at the age of 66 in San 
        Luis, Arizona, only miles from his birthplace;
Whereas more than 50,000 people attended the funeral services of Cesar Estrada 
        Chavez in Delano, California;
Whereas Cesar Estrada Chavez was laid to rest at the headquarters of the United 
        Farm Workers of America, known as Nuestra Senora de La Paz, located in 
        the Tehachapi Mountains in Keene, California;
Whereas, since the death of Cesar Estrada Chavez, schools, parks, streets, 
        libraries, and other public facilities, as well as awards and 
        scholarships, have been named in his honor;
Whereas 10 States and dozens of communities across the United States honor the 
        life and legacy of Cesar Estrada Chavez on March 31st of each year;
Whereas, during his lifetime, Cesar Estrada Chavez was a recipient of the Martin 
        Luther King, Jr. Peace Prize;
Whereas, on August 8, 1994, Cesar Estrada Chavez was posthumously awarded the 
        Presidential Medal of Freedom;
Whereas President Barack Obama honored the life of service of Cesar Estrada 
        Chavez by proclaiming March 31, 2012, to be ``Cesar Chavez Day'';
Whereas, on October 8, 2012, President Barack Obama authorized the Secretary of 
        the Interior to establish a Cesar Estrada Chavez National Monument in 
        Keene, California; and
Whereas the United States should continue the efforts of Cesar Estrada Chavez to 
        ensure equality, justice, and dignity for all people of the United 
        States: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes the accomplishments and example of a great 
        hero of the United States, Cesar Estrada Chavez;
            (2) pledges to promote the legacy of Cesar Estrada Chavez; 
        and
            (3) encourages the people of the United States to 
        commemorate the legacy of Cesar Estrada Chavez and to always 
        remember his great rallying cry, ``<up-sd-dn !>Si, se puede!'', 
        which is Spanish for ``Yes, we can!''.
                                 <all>