Text: H.Res.134 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 134

Condemning the Democratic People’s Republic of Korea for its continuing acts of aggression, its expressed intent to break the July 10, 1953, Korean War Armistice Agreement, and for its repeated violations of United Nations Security Council resolutions.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
March 21, 2013

Mr. Hanna (for himself and Mr. Higgins) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Condemning the Democratic People’s Republic of Korea for its continuing acts of aggression, its expressed intent to break the July 10, 1953, Korean War Armistice Agreement, and for its repeated violations of United Nations Security Council resolutions.

Whereas on December 12, 2012, the Democratic People’s Republic of Korea conducted a rocket launch using ballistic missile technology;

Whereas the December 12, 2012, launch using ballistic missile technology was carried out in violation of United Nations Security Council 1718 (2006), and Resolution 1695 (2006), and 1874 (2009);

Whereas on January 23, 2013, North Korea declared intent to no longer recognize the Six-Party Talks and the September 19, 2005, Joint Statement;

Whereas North Korea vowed on January 23, 2013, to “take physical actions to strengthen self-defense military capabilities including nuclear deterrence”;

Whereas North Korea expressed on January 24, 2013, that they “should settle accounts with the United States only with the gun barrel, not with words”;

Whereas on February 12, 2013, a nuclear device was exploded through a nuclear test conducted by North Korea;

Whereas the February 12, 2013, nuclear test conducted by North Korea is in violation of United Nations Security Council Resolutions 1718 (2006), 1874 (2009), and 2087 (2013);

Whereas North Korea’s ballistic missile program poses a continuing and increasing threat to the national security, people, and allies of the United States within the Asia Pacific region and around the world;

Whereas on March 7, 2013, North Korea threatened to “exercise the right to a pre-emptive nuclear attack” against the United States;

Whereas North Korea has deliberately and consciously acted in violation of the July 10, 1953, Korean War Armistice Agreement;

Whereas North Korea announced on March 11, 2013, its intention to treat the July 10, 1953, Korean War Armistice Agreement as “scrapped completely”; and

Whereas North Korea is a flagrant violator of human rights against its people: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) condemns the Democratic People’s Republic of Korea for its—

(A) deliberate continued violations of United Nations Security Council resolutions;

(B) December 12, 2012, ballistic missile launch;

(C) February 12, 2013, explosion of a nuclear device; and

(D) threats and acts of provocation that aim to destabilize international security;

(2) calls for North Korea to renounce any further acts of aggression and abide by the Korean War Armistice Agreement;

(3) condemns North Korea for its acts of oppression against its people and their human liberties;

(4) reaffirms the support of the United States to its strategic allies and its support of maintaining goals which promote the peace and international stability shared by the allies of the United States throughout the Asia-Pacific region and beyond; and

(5) supports United Nations Security Council Resolution 2094 (2013), and calls on the United States Government and all responsible nations to apply all sanctions and obligations contained within United Nations Security Council Resolutions 1695 (2006), 1718 (2006), 1874 (2009), 2087 (2013), and 2094 (2013).