Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/05/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/14/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/11/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/08/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/08/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/13/2014