Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/03/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/03/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/06/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 05/07/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/20/2013