Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/01/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/01/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/30/2014