Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2013