Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/24/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/06/2013