Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/24/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/26/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/08/2013