Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/2013