Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/07/2014