Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/13/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/31/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/19/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/01/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/25/2014