Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/23/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/30/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/14/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/18/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/18/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/11/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/11/2014