Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/16/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014