Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/19/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/19/2014