Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/25/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/25/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/27/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/09/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/30/2013