Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/22/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/30/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/29/2014