Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2013