Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/16/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/16/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/08/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/18/2014