Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/04/2014