Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/18/2014