Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/30/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/16/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/05/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/10/2014