Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/17/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/18/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/18/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/18/2014