Text: H.Res.235 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 235


Expressing support for designation of March 29 as Vietnam Veterans Day.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

May 23, 2013

Mr. Grimm (for himself and Mr. Sires) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform


RESOLUTION

Expressing support for designation of March 29 as Vietnam Veterans Day.

    Whereas 39 years ago, on March 29, 1973, the last 2,500 troops were withdrawn from South Vietnam thus ending military involvement in what is now the longest war in United States history;

    Whereas 38 years ago, on March 29, 1974, was declared Vietnam Veterans Day by Presidential order with the support of Congress;

    Whereas the 58,195 honorable and brave souls who fought and died during the Vietnam War, ones who are missing, and those who died since from the consequences of that war, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas March 29, 2012, was declared Vietnam Veterans Day by Presidential Proclamation with the support of Congress on the eve of the 50th anniversary commemoration of the beginning of the Vietnam War;

    Whereas the men and women who served with dedication, honor, and pride during the Vietnam War, both in country and in support of those in harm’s way as well as those protecting our freedoms at home and throughout other parts of the world at that time, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas the families whose loved ones gave their lives for our country during the Vietnam War, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas the families of those men and women who came home with the physical and emotional wounds of the Vietnam War and committed to a lifetime of care and support for their loved one, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas the fellow citizens who stood by and supported the families of the fallen as well as the Vietnam veterans who returned and their families, without reservation and with loving care and respect, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas those professionals and volunteers who committed themselves to the loving care and healing of the bodily and emotionally wounded from the Vietnam War at home and have already the utmost gratitude of those they cared for and of their families, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas the men and women of the allies who served with dedication, honor, and pride alongside the Nation’s defenders during the Vietnam War, both in country and in support of those in harm’s way as well as those protecting our freedoms and throughout other parts of the world at that time, deserve the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas this expression of gratitude and respect to the Vietnam Veterans and their families will also give hope and assurance, to current and future generations of the Nation’s defenders and their respective families, that their sacrifice and service will not be forgotten and deserving of a distinct recognition of the eternal gratitude and respect of this Nation;

    Whereas this expression of gratitude and respect for the honorable sacrifice and service by the Vietnam Veterans, past as well as current and future generations of the Nation’s defenders and their respective families, needs to remain in the hearts and thoughts of fellow citizens forever, passed on from generation to generation; and

    Whereas numerous States have already chosen March 29 as Vietnam Veterans Day by legislation and many more States have joined with individual events to honor and thank these brave Veterans and their families for their service to the Nation: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives supports the designation of Vietnam Veterans Day.


Share This