Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2013