Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/19/2013