Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/04/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/04/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/04/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/04/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 02/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/11/2013