Text: H.Res.24 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/14/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 24 Introduced in House (IH)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 24

 Expressing the deep disappointment of the House of Representatives in 
 the enactment by the Russia Government of a law ending inter-country 
adoptions of Russian children by United States citizens and urging the 
 Russia Government to reconsider the law and prioritize the processing 
 of inter-country adoptions involving parentless Russian children who 
 were already matched with United States families before the enactment 
                              of the law.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 14, 2013

Mrs. Bachmann (for herself, Ms. Bass, Mr. Fitzpatrick, Ms. Jackson Lee, 
 Mr. Burgess, Mr. Tiberi, Mr. Brady of Texas, Mr. Nunnelee, Mr. Franks 
of Arizona, Mr. Aderholt, Mr. Marino, Mr. Huizenga of Michigan, and Mr. 
Palazzo) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                      Committee on Foreign Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Expressing the deep disappointment of the House of Representatives in 
 the enactment by the Russia Government of a law ending inter-country 
adoptions of Russian children by United States citizens and urging the 
 Russia Government to reconsider the law and prioritize the processing 
 of inter-country adoptions involving parentless Russian children who 
 were already matched with United States families before the enactment 
                              of the law.

Whereas United Nations Children's Fund (UNICEF) estimates that there are 740,000 
        children in Russia living without parental care;
Whereas the Ministry of Science and Education of Russia estimates that 110,000 
        children live in state institutions in Russia;
Whereas the number of adoptions by Russian families is modest, with only 7,400 
        domestic adoptions in 2011 compared with 3,400 adoptions of Russian 
        children by families abroad;
Whereas, on December 28, 2012, Russian Federation President Vladimir Putin 
        signed into law legislation entitled ``On Measures Concerning the 
        Implementation of Government Policy on Orphaned Children and those 
        without Parental Care'', which includes language that permanently bans 
        adoptions of Russian children by United States citizens;
Whereas a spokesman for President Putin, Dmitry Peskov, announced that the law 
        is to take effect on January 1, 2013, thereby abrogating the bilateral 
        agreement between Russia and the United States that entered into force 
        on November 1, 2012, and requires both countries to provide one year 
        notice of intent to terminate the agreement;
Whereas 46, and possibly more, inter-country adoptions of Russian children by 
        United States families have already received a final adoption decree 
        from the Russia judicial system, and hundreds of other United States 
        families are in the process of adopting Russian children;
Whereas United Nations Children's Fund released a statement urging the Russia 
        Government to ensure that ``the current plight of the many Russian 
        children in institutions receives priority attention'' and that the 
        Russia Government consider alternatives to institutionalization 
        including ``domestic adoption and inter-country adoption'';
Whereas the United Nations, the Hague Conference on Private International Law, 
        and other international organizations have recognized a child's right to 
        a family as a basic human right worthy of protection;
Whereas the Christian Alliance for Orphans reports that United States families 
        have opened their homes to more than 179,000 orphans from overseas in 
        the last 20 years;
Whereas after China and Ethiopia, Russia is the third most popular country for 
        United States citizens who adopt internationally;
Whereas adoption, both domestic and international, is an important child 
        protection tool and an integral part of child welfare best practices 
        around the world, along with prevention of abandonment and family 
        reunification; and
Whereas more than 60,000 Russia-born children have found safe, permanent, and 
        loving homes with United States families over the last two decades: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) affirms that all children deserve a permanent, 
        protective family;
            (2) values the long tradition of the United States and 
        Russia Governments working together to find permanent homes for 
        unparented children;
            (3) disapproves of the Russia law ending inter-country 
        adoptions of Russian children by United States citizens because 
        it primarily harms vulnerable and voiceless children; and
            (4) strongly urges the Russia Government to reconsider the 
        law on humanitarian grounds, in consideration of the well-being 
        of parentless Russian children awaiting a loving and permanent 
        family, and prioritize the processing of inter-country 
        adoptions of Russian children by United States citizens that 
        were initiated before the enactment of the law.
                                 <all>