There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for prayer at school board meetings.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/06/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/19/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary06/06/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.250. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2013)

Recognizes school boards as deliberative public bodies that should be free to engage in prayer at the beginning of meetings consistent with the prayer practice upheld in Marsh v. Chambers.

Expresses support for the voluntary practice of prayer at the beginning of meetings of legislative bodies and other deliberative public bodies, including school board meetings.