Text: H.Res.251 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 251

To honor Larry Holmes for his career and community service on the 35th anniversary of his winning the WBC World Heavyweight Title.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
June 6, 2013

Mr. Cartwright (for himself and Mr. Dent) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform


RESOLUTION

To honor Larry Holmes for his career and community service on the 35th anniversary of his winning the WBC World Heavyweight Title.

Whereas Larry Holmes is a retired American professional boxer;

Whereas Holmes was born on November 3, 1949;

Whereas Holmes defeated Ken Norton on June 9, 1978, to become the WBC World Heavyweight Champion;

Whereas Holmes won 48 consecutive bouts and retained his title for over 7 years;

Whereas Holmes defeated Muhammad Ali, who is known as “the greatest of all time”, on February 10, 1980;

Whereas Holmes finished his career with a record of 69–6 and was inducted into the International Boxing Hall of Fame;

Whereas his success has not been limited to the boxing ring;

Whereas Holmes has successfully run a number of businesses in and around downtown Easton, Pennsylvania, participating in a renewal of the area;

Whereas his investments in Easton have included many charitable endeavors;

Whereas his “Run with the Champ” 5-kilometer race has helped raise awareness of physical fitness for 35 years;

Whereas Holmes has endowed a charitable foundation that advances post-secondary education by awarding four $5,000 scholarships to students who enroll in community colleges;

Whereas Holmes has received the Jaycee’s National Outstanding Young Man Award;

Whereas the Daughters of the American Revolution awarded Holmes the Medal of Honor for trustworthiness; and

Whereas Holmes has been a pillar of his community: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives honors Larry Holmes on the 35th anniversary of his WBC World Heavyweight Championship victory—

(1) for his stellar boxing career; and

(2) for the meaningful community service he has performed throughout his life.