Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/07/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/25/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/25/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/26/2014