Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/28/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/11/2013