Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 06/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/28/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/28/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/18/2014